Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan d’Arkel

Deceased

Bishop of Liège


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Nov 1342AppointedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
15 Apr 1364AppointedBishop of Liège, Belgium
1 Jul 1378DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jan d’Arkel:
Bishop Jan d’Arkel (died ) Bishop of Liège

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1316
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 491, and Page 302

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 5 Jan 2014