Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de Bourbon

Deceased

Bishop of Liège, Belgium


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Apr 1455AppointedBishop of Liège, Belgium
1 May 1467Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
30 Aug 1482DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Louis de Bourbon
Bishop Louis de Bourbon (died ) Bishop of Liège

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 175
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,490

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast