Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Évangéliste Zäpfel (Zaepfell)

Deceased

Bishop of Liège, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1736Born
176225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
29 Apr 180265.4SelectedBishop of Liège, Belgium
3 Jun 180265.5ConfirmedBishop of Liège, Belgium
7 Jun 180265.5Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
17 Oct 180871.8DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean-Évangéliste Zäpfel (Zaepfell) (VIAF: 14788471)
Bishop Jean-Évangéliste Zäpfel (Zaepfell) (born , died ) Bishop of Liège

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDambach

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast