Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jozef-Maria Heuschen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hasselt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1915BornTongeren
11 Sep 193924.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 196247.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium
25 Jul 196247.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Druas
21 Sep 196247.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Druas
13 Jun 196751.9AppointedBishop of Hasselt, Belgium
15 Dec 198974.4RetiredBishop of Hasselt, Belgium
30 Jun 200287.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Hasselt, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jozef-Maria Heuschen:
Bishop Jozef-Maria Heuschen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hasselt

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 155
  • op: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2002, Page 243
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013