Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Louis d’Elderen

Deceased

Bishop of Liège


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1620³BornGenoels Elderen
16 Mar 166948.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Liège, Belgium
10 Feb 167049.3Ordained PriestPriest of Liège, Belgium
17 Aug 168867.8SelectedBishop of Liège, Belgium
15 Nov 168868.1ConfirmedBishop of Liège, Belgium
27 Dec 168868.2Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
1 Feb 169473.3DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Louis d’Elderen:
Bishop Jean Louis d’Elderen (born , died ) Bishop of Liège

  • a priest for 23.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 241
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015