Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Augustinus Paredis

Deceased

Bishop of Roermond


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1795BornBree
7 Apr 182125.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jun 184044.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Limburg, Netherlands
24 Nov 184045.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hirina
30 Jun 184145.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hirina
4 Mar 185357.5AppointedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
18 Jun 188690.8DiedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Joannes Augustinus Paredis:
Bishop Joannes Augustinus Paredis (born , died ) Bishop of Roermond

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 45.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 488
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014