Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Fryns, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kindu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1910BornLa Calamine, Belgium
12 Jul 193626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
12 Apr 195746.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
12 Apr 195746.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ariassus
7 Jul 195747.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ariassus
10 Nov 195949.3AppointedBishop of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Jul 196554.9DiedBishop of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Jean Fryns:
Bishop Jean Fryns C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop of Kindu

  • a priest for 28.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015