Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelius Richard Antoon van Bommel

Deceased

Bishop of Liège


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1790³BornLeyden
8 Jun 181626.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 182939.1AppointedBishop of Liège, Belgium
15 Nov 182939.6Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
7 Apr 185262.0DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cornelius Richard Antoon van Bommel:
Bishop Cornelius Richard Antoon van Bommel (born , died ) Bishop of Liège

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014