Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ferdinand von Bayern

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Bishop of Hildesheim

Bishop of Liège

Bishop of Münster

Bishop of Paderborn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1577Born
19 Apr 159517.5SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
4 Jan 159719.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
160123.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Liège, Belgium
29 Apr 160224.5ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Liège, Belgium
2 Jan 161133.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
18 May 161133.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
5 Aug 161133.8SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Münster, Germany
10 Feb 161234.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
17 Feb 161234.3SucceededArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
17 Feb 161234.3SucceededBishop of Liège, Belgium
17 Feb 161234.3SucceededBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
18 Feb 161234.3ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
5 Jul 161234.7ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
13 Dec 161841.1SucceededBishop of Paderborn, Germany
13 Sep 165072.9DiedArchbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand von Bayern (VIAF: 13049116)
Father Ferdinand von Bayern (born , died ) Archbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünchen

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1596
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 156, and Page 203
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 219, and Page 246
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018