Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre van den Hende, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Dariensis


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jun 1525AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium
7 Jun 1525AppointedTitular Bishop of Dariensis
30 Nov 1525Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dariensis
27 Jul 1537DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Pierre van den Hende
Bishop Pierre van den Hende O.S.A. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Liège

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAugustins, Convent, Bruges

  • a bishop for 11.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 185
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1525, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jun 2018

Quantcast