Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine-Hubert Grauls, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Gitega

Titular Archbishop of Giru Marcelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1899BornKortessem, Belgium
16 Jul 192324.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
23 Dec 193637.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Urundi, Burundi
23 Dec 193637.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mades
5 Apr 193738.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mades
10 Nov 195960.8AppointedArchbishop of Gitega, Burundi
16 Oct 196768.7ResignedArchbishop of Gitega, Burundi
16 Oct 196768.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Giru Marcelli
26 Jul 198687.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Gitega, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Hubert Grauls:
Archbishop Antoine-Hubert Grauls M. Afr. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gitega

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 49.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013