Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Antoine Blavier, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Liège

Titular Bishop of Dionysias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1620BornLiege
163918.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
23 Oct 164424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
4 May 165433.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium
4 May 165433.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
1692²71.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium
9 Jul 169978.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Antoine Blavier:
Bishop Jean Antoine Blavier O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Liège

  • a priest for 54.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 175
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015