Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène Lambert Adrian Rixen

Bishop Emeritus of Goiás, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1944 Born
26 Jun 197025.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 199551.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 Nov 199551.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabbora
25 Feb 199651.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabbora
2 Dec 199854.4AppointedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
21 Sep 201167.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of São Félix, Mato Grosso, Brazil
21 Mar 201267.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of São Félix, Mato Grosso, Brazil
27 May 202075.8RetiredBishop of Goiás, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Eugène Lambert Adrian Rixen
Bishop Eugène Lambert Adrian Rixen (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Goiás

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKelmis, Belgium
Ordained BishopAraçatuba, Diocese of Araçatuba, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Goiás.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: CB, 21 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,689
  • r: Bollettino, 27 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast