Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Félix Scalais, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Léopoldville

Titular Archbishop of Aquae in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1904BornBurdinne, Belgium
17 Aug 193025.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
29 Jun 195348.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Jun 195348.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Casius
21 Sep 195348.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casius
10 Nov 195954.9AppointedArchbishop of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
7 Jul 196459.5ResignedArchbishop of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
7 Jul 196459.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aquae in Numidia
17 Aug 196762.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Félix Scalais:
Archbishop Félix Scalais C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Léopoldville

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015