Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop César Constantin François de Hoensbroeck

Deceased

Bishop of Liège


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1724³BornEysden
27 May 175227.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Liège, Belgium
28 May 175227.7Ordained PriestPriest of Liège, Belgium
21 Jul 178459.8SelectedBishop of Liège, Belgium
20 Sep 178460.0ConfirmedBishop of Liège, Belgium
19 Dec 178460.3Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
3 Jun 179267.7DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for César Constantin François de Hoensbroeck:
Bishop César Constantin François de Hoensbroeck (born , died ) Bishop of Liège

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 258
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016