Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Louis de Berghes

Deceased

Bishop of Liège


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1662BornBrussels
7 Feb 172461.4SelectedBishop of Liège, Belgium
27 Sep 172462.0ConfirmedBishop of Liège, Belgium
17 Dec 172462.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Dec 172462.3Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
4 Dec 174381.2DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Georges Louis de Berghes (VIAF: 169785934)
Bishop Georges Louis de Berghes (born , died ) Bishop of Liège

  • a priest for 18.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 242
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 Sep 2016