Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Piotr Bab

Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland

Titular Bishop of Arna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1974 Born
22 May 199924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lublin, Poland
22 May 202045.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
22 May 202045.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arna
29 Jun 202045.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arna

MicroData Summary for Adam Piotr Bab
Bishop Adam Piotr Bab (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLublin, Archdiocese of Lublin
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lublin, Archdiocese of Lublin

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Lublin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 May 2020
  • ob: CB, 26 May 2020
  • c2+: CB, 26 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 29 Jun 2020

Quantcast