Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Pereira

Bishop of Jammu-Srinagar, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1964 Born
15 May 199328.9Ordained PriestPriest of Jammu-Srinagar, India
3 Dec 201450.5AppointedBishop of Jammu-Srinagar, India
21 Feb 201550.7Ordained BishopBishop of Jammu-Srinagar, India

MicroData Summary for Ivan Pereira
Bishop Ivan Pereira (born ) Bishop of Jammu-Srinagar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVasai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jammu-Srinagar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2014
  • ob: CB, 9 Dec 2014
  • c2+: CB, 15 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast