Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henryk Mieczysław Jagodziński

Apostolic Nuncio to South Africa

Titular Archbishop of Limosano

Apostolic Nuncio to Lesotho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1969 Born
3 Jun 199526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kielce, Poland
3 May 202051.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ghana
3 May 202051.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Limosano
18 Jul 202051.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Limosano
16 Apr 202455.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to South Africa
16 Apr 202455.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lesotho

MicroData Summary for Henryk Mieczysław Jagodziński
(VIAF: 250230963; WikiData: Q9288231)
Archbishop Henryk Mieczysław Jagodziński (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of South Africa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMałogoszcz
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Kielce, Diocese of Kielce, Poland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to South Africa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 May 2020
  • ob: CB, 25 May 2020
  • c34: CB, 6 Jul 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 245, Number 20,450
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 9 Jun 2024