Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basil Bhuriya, S.V.D.

Bishop of Jhabua, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1956 Born
12 Jun 198529.2Solemn VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
5 May 198630.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
18 Jul 201559.3AppointedBishop of Jhabua, India
10 Oct 201559.5Ordained BishopBishop of Jhabua, India

MicroData Summary for Basil Bhuriya
Bishop Basil Bhuriya S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Jhabua

EventPlace
Birth PlacePanchjui

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jhabua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 4 Aug 2015
  • c34: CB, 10 Oct 2015
  • c4: CB, 11 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,660

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018