Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francis Xavier Kriengsak Cardinal Kovithavanij

Archbishop of Bangkok

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Addolorata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1949 BornBan Rak
11 Jul 197627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bangkok, Thailand
7 Mar 200757.6AppointedBishop of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand
2 Jun 200757.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand
14 May 200959.8AppointedArchbishop of Bangkok, Thailand
16 Aug 200960.1InstalledArchbishop of Bangkok, Thailand
14 Feb 201565.6Elevated to Cardinal
14 Feb 201565.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Addolorata

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Kriengsak Kovithavanij:
Francis Xavier Kriengsak Cardinal Kovithavanij (born ) Archbishop of Bangkok

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Bangkok.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,427
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 May 2009
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 14 Feb 2015