Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Grzegorz Suchodolski

Auxiliary Bishop of Siedlce, Poland

Titular Bishop of Mesarfelta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1963 Born
11 Jun 198824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Siedlce, Poland
16 Apr 202056.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Siedlce, Poland
16 Apr 202056.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mesarfelta
1 Jun 202056.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mesarfelta

MicroData Summary for Grzegorz Suchodolski
Bishop Grzegorz Suchodolski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Siedlce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŁuków, Diocese of Siedlce
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral, Siedlce, Diocese of Siedlce

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Siedlce.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2020
  • c2+: CB, 28 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Jun 2020

Quantcast