Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrose Rebello

Bishop of Aurangabad, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1949 Born
22 Apr 197930.1Ordained PriestPriest of Aurangabad, India
13 May 201566.2AppointedBishop of Aurangabad, India
28 Aug 201566.5Ordained BishopBishop of Aurangabad, India

MicroData Summary for Ambrose Rebello
Bishop Ambrose Rebello (born ) Bishop of Aurangabad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNirmal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aurangabad.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 May 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 May 2015
  • c34: CB, 2 Aug 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,562

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast