Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bhagyaiah Chinnabathini

Bishop of Guntur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1956 BornMotakondur-Yadagirigutta Mandal
3 May 198326.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 201659.7AppointedBishop of Guntur, India
8 Sep 201659.9Ordained BishopBishop of Guntur, India

MicroData Summary for Bhagyaiah Chinnabathini
Bishop Bhagyaiah Chinnabathini (born ) Bishop of Guntur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guntur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2016
  • ob: CB, 4 Aug 2016
  • c2+: CB, 30 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Sep 2016