Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Marie Prida Inthirath

Vicar Apostolic of Savannakhet, Laos

Titular Bishop of Lemfocta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1957 Born
20 Apr 198629.1Ordained PriestPriest of Savannakhet, Laos
9 Jan 201052.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Savannakhet, Laos
9 Jan 201052.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lemfocta
10 Apr 201053.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lemfocta

MicroData Summary for Jean Marie Prida Inthirath
Bishop Jean Marie Prida Inthirath (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Savannakhet

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuang Phine

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Savannakhet.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,618

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast