Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Grzegorz Olszowski

Auxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland

Titular Bishop of Rhoga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1967 Born
13 May 199528.2Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
13 Jun 201851.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland
13 Jun 201851.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhoga
12 Sep 201851.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhoga

MicroData Summary for Grzegorz Olszowski
Bishop Grzegorz Olszowski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Katowice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMikołów
Ordained BishopCathedral, Katowice, Archdiocese of Katowice

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Katowice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 Jun 2018
  • c1: CB, 2 Sep 2018
  • c34: CB, 8 Sep 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,848

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast