Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius D’Souza

Bishop of Bareilly


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1964 BornBasrikatte
7 Apr 199126.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lucknow, India
11 Jul 201449.9AppointedBishop of Bareilly, India
4 Oct 201450.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bareilly, India

MicroData Summary for Ignatius D’Souza:
Bishop Ignatius D’Souza (born ) Bishop of Bareilly

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bareilly.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2014
  • c1: CB, 27 Jul 2014
  • ob: CB, 31 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014