Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaya Rao Polimera

Bishop of Eluru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1965 BornDharmasagar
2 Apr 199226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Warangal, India
13 Jun 201347.8AppointedBishop of Eluru, India
25 Jul 201347.9Ordained BishopBishop of Eluru, India

MicroData Summary for Jaya Rao Polimera:
Bishop Jaya Rao Polimera (born ) Bishop of Eluru

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Eluru.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2013
  • ob: CB, 23 Jun 2013
  • c2+: CB, 25 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,841

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013