Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justin Saw Min Thide

Bishop of Hpa-an


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1951 BornThaung, Twante
3 Dec 198332.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Yangon, Myanmar
19 Mar 198433.0Ordained PriestPriest of Yangon, Myanmar
16 Jul 200756.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Yangon, Myanmar
16 Jul 200756.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lemfocta
2 Dec 200756.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lemfocta
24 Jan 200957.8AppointedBishop of Hpa-an, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Justin Saw Min Thide:
Bishop Justin Saw Min Thide (born ) Bishop of Hpa-an

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hpa-an.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2007
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,571
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013