Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Serrao, S.J.

Bishop of Shimoga, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1959 Born
30 Apr 199232.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1 May 199939.7Perpetual VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
19 Mar 201454.5AppointedBishop of Shimoga, India
7 May 201454.7Ordained BishopBishop of Shimoga, India

MicroData Summary for Francis Serrao
Bishop Francis Serrao S.J. (born ) Bishop of Shimoga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoodbidri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Shimoga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2014
  • ob: CB, 8 Apr 2014
  • c2+: CB, 5 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,151

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast