Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kishore Kumar Kujur

Bishop of Rourkela, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1964 Born
7 Feb 199329.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sambalpur, India
26 Jul 201349.5AppointedBishop of Rourkela, India
29 Sep 201349.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rourkela, India

MicroData Summary for Kishore Kumar Kujur
Bishop Kishore Kumar Kujur (born ) Bishop of Rourkela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaibira

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rourkela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,887

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast