Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elias Joseph Gonsalves

Archbishop of Nagpur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1961 Born
11 Apr 199028.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bombay, India
11 Jul 201251.0AppointedBishop of Amravati, India
29 Sep 201251.2Ordained BishopBishop of Amravati, India
3 Dec 201857.4AppointedArchbishop of Nagpur, India

MicroData Summary for Elias Joseph Gonsalves
Archbishop Elias Joseph Gonsalves (born ) Archbishop of Nagpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChulne, Archdiocese of Bombay
Ordained BishopDnyanmata School Pavilion, Amravati, Diocese of Amravati

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Nagpur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2012
  • ob: CB, 27 Jul 2012
  • c2+: CB, 28 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,546
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Dec 2018

Quantcast