Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cajetan Francis Osta

Bishop of Muzaffarpur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1961 Born
9 May 199230.7Ordained PriestPriest of Muzaffarpur, India
11 Jul 201452.9AppointedBishop of Muzaffarpur, India
22 Oct 201453.2Ordained BishopBishop of Muzaffarpur, India

MicroData Summary for Cajetan Francis Osta
Bishop Cajetan Francis Osta (born ) Bishop of Muzaffarpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKathara-Bokaro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Muzaffarpur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2014
  • ob: CB, 18 Aug 2014
  • c2+: CB, 23 Oct 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,310

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast