Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antony Prince Panengaden

Bishop of Adilabad (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1976 Born
25 Apr 200730.9Ordained PriestPriest of Adilabad (Syro-Malabar), India
6 Aug 201539.2AppointedBishop of Adilabad (Syro-Malabar), India
29 Oct 201539.4Ordained BishopBishop of Adilabad (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Antony Prince Panengaden
Bishop Antony Prince Panengaden (born ) Bishop of Adilabad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArimpur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Adilabad (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2015
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Aug 2015
  • c3: CB, 29 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,666

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018