Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Udumala Bala Showreddy

Bishop of Warangal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1954 BornGhanpur, Gudur
20 Feb 197924.7Ordained PriestPriest of Warangal, India
13 Apr 201358.8AppointedBishop of Warangal, India
23 May 201358.9Ordained BishopBishop of Warangal, India

MicroData Summary for Udumala Bala Showreddy:
Bishop Udumala Bala Showreddy (born ) Bishop of Warangal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Warangal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,791

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013