Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theodore Mascarenhas, S.F.X.

Auxiliary Bishop of Ranchi, India

Titular Bishop of Lysinia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1960 Born
14 Jun 197918.5ProfessedMember of Society of the Missionaries of Saint Francis Xavier
24 Apr 198827.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Missionaries of Saint Francis Xavier
2006²45.1AppointedOfficial of the Pontifical Council for Culture
2010²49.1ResignedOfficial of the Pontifical Council for Culture
9 Jul 201453.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ranchi, India
9 Jul 201453.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lysinia
30 Aug 201453.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lysinia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Theodore Mascarenhas (VIAF: 12597190)
Bishop Theodore Mascarenhas S.F.X. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ranchi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamurlim

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Ranchi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast