Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Simick

Vicar Apostolic of Nepal

Titular Bishop of Maturba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1963 Born
9 Apr 199228.6Ordained PriestPriest of Darjeeling, India
25 Apr 201450.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nepal
25 Apr 201450.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Maturba
29 Jun 201450.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maturba

MicroData Summary for Paul Simick
Bishop Paul Simick (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Nepal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGitdubling, India

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Nepal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2014
  • ob: CB, 27 Apr 2014
  • c2: CB, 30 Jun 2014
  • c34: CB, 1 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018