Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Hii Teck Kwong

Bishop of Sibu, Malaysia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1965 Born
25 Mar 199327.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sibu, Malaysia
25 Jan 200842.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sibu, Malaysia
25 Jan 200842.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Medianum
1 May 200842.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Medianum
24 Dec 201146.4AppointedBishop of Sibu, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Hii Teck Kwong
Bishop Joseph Hii Teck Kwong (born ) Bishop of Sibu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSibu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sibu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,732
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast