Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pius Thomas D’Souza

Bishop of Ajmer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1954 BornBantwal
28 Mar 198227.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lucknow, India
19 Jan 198934.7IncardinatedPriest of Bareilly, India
3 Nov 201258.5AppointedBishop of Ajmer, India
19 Jan 201358.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ajmer, India

MicroData Summary for Pius Thomas D’Souza:
Bishop Pius Thomas D’Souza (born ) Bishop of Ajmer

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ajmer.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2012
  • ob: CB, 19 Jan 2013
  • c2+: CB, 20 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,647

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013