Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Kaipuram, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Balasore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1954Born
2 May 197925.2Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Mission
20 Dec 198026.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
9 Dec 201359.8AppointedBishop of Balasore, India
30 Jan 201459.9Ordained BishopBishop of Balasore, India
22 Apr 201965.2DiedBishop of Balasore, India

MicroData Summary for Simon Kaipuram (VIAF: 282889545)
Bishop Simon Kaipuram C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Balasore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThanneermukkom
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Balasore, Diocese of Balasore
Death PlaceJyoti, Hospital, Balasore, Diocese of Balasore

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Dec 2013
  • c34: CB, 4 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,086
  • d: CB, 22 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 23 Apr 2019

Quantcast