Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Basilio Athai

Archbishop of Taunggyi

Titular Bishop of Tasaccora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1956 BornKyekadaw
1 Apr 198427.6Ordained PriestPriest of Loikaw, Myanmar
28 Jun 200851.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Taunggyi, Myanmar
28 Jun 200851.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tasaccora
18 Nov 200852.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tasaccora
12 Apr 201558.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Taunggyi, Myanmar
24 Jun 201659.9AppointedArchbishop of Taunggyi, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Basilio Athai
Archbishop Basilio Athai (born ) Archbishop of Taunggyi

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Taunggyi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,988
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jun 2016