Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Mattekatt

Bishop of Diphu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1961 BornThuravoor
31 Dec 198827.6Ordained PriestPriest of Diphu, India
26 Jul 201352.2AppointedBishop of Diphu, India
6 Oct 201352.3Ordained BishopBishop of Diphu, India

MicroData Summary for Paul Mattekatt:
Bishop Paul Mattekatt (born ) Bishop of Diphu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Diphu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2013
  • ob: CB, 13 Aug 2013
  • c2+: CB, 5 Sep 2013
  • c34: CB, 6 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 7 Oct 2013