Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alex Joseph Vadakumthala

Bishop of Kannur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1959 BornMaradu-Panangad
19 Dec 198425.5Ordained PriestPriest of Verapoly, India
1 Feb 201454.6AppointedBishop of Kannur, India
23 Mar 201454.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kannur, India

MicroData Summary for Alex Joseph Vadakumthala:
Bishop Alex Joseph Vadakumthala (born ) Bishop of Kannur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kannur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 11 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015