Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niranjan Sual Singh

Bishop of Sambalpur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1961 BornKottama
29 Apr 199129.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cuttack-Bhubaneswar, India
26 Jul 201352.0AppointedBishop of Sambalpur, India
28 Sep 201352.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sambalpur, India

MicroData Summary for Niranjan Sual Singh:
Bishop Niranjan Sual Singh (born ) Bishop of Sambalpur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sambalpur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 16 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,886
  • c4: CB, 2 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013