Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugene Joseph

Bishop of Varanasi, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1958 Born
10 Apr 198526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Varanasi, India
Dec 2013³55.3AppointedAdministrator of Varanasi, India
30 May 201556.8AppointedBishop of Varanasi, India
24 Aug 201557.0Ordained BishopBishop of Varanasi, India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eugene Joseph
Bishop Eugene Joseph (born ) Bishop of Varanasi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRajakamangalam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Varanasi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 May 2015
  • bp/bd: CB, 12 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2+: CB, 5 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,561

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast