Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Domenico Giordani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Teano

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1700BornMontis S. Angeli
8 Apr 172525.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 174949.8AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
8 Dec 174949.8Ordained BishopBishop of Teano, Italy
7 Jul 175555.4ResignedBishop of Teano, Italy
4 Aug 175555.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
22 Dec 176666.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
24 Feb 178181.0DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

MicroData Summary for Domenico Giordani:
Patriarch Domenico Giordani (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Teano

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 87, and Page 309
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 399
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014