Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Centini

Deceased

Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1700Born
4 Nov 173131.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 176059.5AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
25 Mar 176059.5Ordained BishopBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
15 May 177069.7DiedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Centini
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Centini (born , died ) Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAscoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast