Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Pantuliano

Deceased

Bishop of Policastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1708BornPolla
13 Jul 173224.3Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 176253.8AppointedBishop of Policastro, Italy
31 Jan 176253.8Ordained BishopBishop of Policastro, Italy
21 Jun 177567.2DiedBishop of Policastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Pantuliano:
Bishop Francesco Pantuliano (died ) Bishop of Policastro

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013