Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Fogliani

Deceased

Bishop of Modena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1700Born
6 Apr 172625.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 175757.3AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
27 Dec 175757.4Ordained BishopBishop of Modena, Italy
18 Oct 178585.2DiedBishop of Modena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Fogliani
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Fogliani (born , died ) Bishop of Modena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastello Querciola

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast