Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Perrelli

Deceased

Bishop of Penne e Atri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1705Born
18 Dec 172823.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 175549.5AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
25 Jul 175549.6Ordained BishopBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
27 May 176155.4DiedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Perrelli
Bishop Gennaro Perrelli (born , died ) Bishop of Penne e Atri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 332
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast